IL HB3490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Education Scholarship Law. Provides that "approved institution" includes specified institutions with pre-licensure nursing education programs and post-licensure nursing education programs approved by the Illinois Board of Higher Education or any successor agency with similar authority. Corrects a reference to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURSING EDUCATION SCHOLARSHIPS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1109753Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback