IL HB3483 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health, subject to appropriation or other available funding, shall conduct a program to promote awareness of firearms restraining orders to the general public. Provides that beginning July 1, 2022, the program must include the development and dissemination, through print, digital, and broadcast media, of public service announcements that publicize the options victims of domestic violence have to seek help with special emphasis on the firearms restraining order. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall develop and approve a standard curriculum for a training program on the Firearms Restraining Order Act. Provides that the Board shall conduct a training program that trains officers on the use of firearms restraining orders, how to identify situations in which a firearms restraining order is appropriate, and how to safely promote the usage of the firearms restraining order in a domestic violence situation. Officers who have successfully completed this program shall be issued a certificate attesting to their attendance. Amends the Firearms Restraining Order Act. Provides that a firearms restraining order includes the seizure of the respondent's ammunition. Provides that "family member of the respondent" includes a former spouse and a person with whom the respondent has or allegedly has a child in common. Provides that a petition for a firearms restraining order may be filed in any county where an incident occurred that involved the respondent posing an immediate and present danger of causing personal injury to the respondent or another by having in his or her custody or control, or purchasing, possessing, or receiving, a firearm or ammunition. Includes printing a petition for a firearms restraining order for which no fees may be charged by the circuit clerk. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall submit a yearly report to the General Assembly concerning the applications and issuance of firearms restraining orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARMS RESTRAINING ORDER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Stoneback
2021-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-18HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Stoneback
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Stoneback

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-705New CodeSee Bill Text
4306710Amended CodeCitation Text
4306735Amended CodeCitation Text
4306740Amended CodeCitation Text
4306745Amended CodeCitation Text
430675Amended CodeCitation Text
4306785New CodeSee Bill Text
507057.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback