IL HB3482 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Lake Michigan Wind Energy Act. Provides that the Offshore Wind Energy Economic Development Policy Task Force shall report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly within 12 months of convening. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall adopt rules by which it may grant in the name of the State of Illinois permits and site leases with respect to public trust lands of Lake Michigan for the assessment of sites for offshore wind energy development. Provides that if the Department receives an application for such a site assessment permit and lease in advance of the adoption of such rules, the Department may grant such permit and lease, and in considering such application shall take into account the general principles set forth in the Act as well as existing environmental, marine, public infrastructure, transportation, and security uses and factors. Provides that in advance of rulemaking specific to the Act no site for which an assessment permit or lease is granted shall be within 3 miles of the shore of Lake Michigan, nor shall it include known breeding grounds or habitat of any avian species considered threatened or endangered under federal or State law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LAKE MICHIGAN-PERMIT/LEASE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0283
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 019-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2089620Amended CodeCitation Text
2089625Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback