IL HB3478 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall create a statewide business retention and expansion program and provide technical assistance to program participants. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-BUSINESS RETENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1025New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback