IL HB3478 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Requires State agencies to respond promptly in writing to all inquiries and comments of the Procurement Policy Board. Lowers certain notice requirements from 30 days to 14. Increases the small purchase threshold to $100,000. Creates a Special Committee on Procurement Efficiency, Minority, Female, and Veterans Contracting, and Illinois Preference in Purchasing. Sets forth membership and goals of the Special Committee. Amends the Governmental Joint Purchasing Act. Allows a chief procurement officer to authorize the purchase or lease of personal property, supplies, and services which have been procured through a competitive process by a federal agency or consortium of entities. Requires the filing of certain reports. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
PROCUREMENT/PURCHASING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 20-170 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 20-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 525 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3478&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3478.htm |