IL HB3467 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Community-Integrated Living Arrangements and Developmental Disability Facilities Act. Provides that under certain conditions, a resident of a living arrangement certified under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act and a resident of a developmental disability facility shall be permitted to use an audio and video surveillance system in his or her room at his or her own expense. Requires the electronic monitoring device to be placed in a conspicuously visible location in the room. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a program to distribute specified funds each year for the purchase and installation of electronic monitoring devices. Establishes criminal penalties for a person or entity that knowingly hampers, obstructs, tampers with, or destroys an electronic monitoring device. Contains provisions concerning: resident and roommate consent to monitoring; notice of electronic monitoring to the staff and visitors; limitations on the staff's access to recordings; the admissibility of recordings in civil, criminal, and administrative actions; staff reporting; liability; and rulemaking. Makes other changes. Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act and Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code to make conforming changes. Provides that it is a business offense for a person to discriminate or retaliate against a resident for consenting to the electronic monitoring, or to prevent the installation or use of an electronic monitoring device by a resident who has provided specified notice and consent. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTHORIZED ELECTRONIC MONITOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21013514.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40552-116New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback