IL HB3465 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that each institution or facility of the Department of Corrections shall hire a reentry specialist to assist with the reentry of offenders into the community. Provides that the Department shall by rule provide for the duties and responsibilities of reentry specialists.
Title
CD CORR-REENTRY SPECIALIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0760 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-04-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |