IL HB3462 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Bill of Rights for Children. Provides that every child reported to the Department of Children and Family Services or law enforcement to be a victim of sexual assault or sexual abuse whose case is accepted by either agency for investigation has the right to have that child's forensic interview conducted by a forensic interviewer from a children's advocacy center accredited according to the Children's Advocacy Center Act and serving the child's area, when such service is available. Provides that the right may be asserted by the child or the child's parent or guardian informing the investigating personnel at the Department of Children and Family Services or the law enforcement agency that the parent or guardian wants the child to have the child's interview conducted by the children's advocacy center.
Title
CHILD FORENSIC INTERVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0477 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |