IL HB3462 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Pharmacy Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides for the licensure (rather than registration) of registered pharmacy technicians, registered certified pharmacy technicians, and pharmacists, and makes conforming changes. Removes provision allowing each member of the State Board of Pharmacy to receive a per diem payment in an amount determined from time to time by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation for attendance at meetings of the Board and conducting other official business of the Board. Changes references to "Director" to references to "Secretary" or "Department" throughout the Act. Eliminates the position of deputy pharmacy coordinator. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, duties of the Department, inactive status, pharmacists in charge, nonresident pharmacy licenses, record retention, automated pharmacy systems, remote prescription processing, and discipline. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PHARMACY PRACTICE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0497 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date September 8, 2017 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-25 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-25 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |