IL HB3459 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to annually report to the General Assembly the data collected by and reported to the Department concerning deaths in which an opioid overdose is determined to be a contributing factor. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that in every case in which an opioid overdose is determined to be a contributing factor in a death, the coroner shall report the death and the age, gender, race, and county of residence, if known, of the decedent to the Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPIOID OVERDOSE REPORTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-316New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-3013Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback