IL HB3455 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that this Act may be cited as the Public Workers' Rights Act. Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Removes provisions concerning fair share agreements. Adds requirements concerning the representation of public employees by exclusive bargaining representatives, including dues deduction authorization provisions, negotiation of collective bargaining agreements, and representation in grievance proceedings. Includes telecommunicators in provisions applying to public safety personnel under the Act. Provides that employees who participate in a strike, work stoppage, or slow down as the result of unfair labor practices committed by the employer shall not be subject to discipline by the employer for such actions. Defines and modifies terms. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LABOR-PUBLIC WORKERS RIGHTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3455&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3455.htm |