IL HB3445 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Opioid Overdose Reduction Act. Provides that the Act may be referred to as Alex's Law. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. In a provision concerning overdose and limited immunity, provides that specified violations must not serve as the sole basis of a violation of parole, mandatory supervised release, probation, conditional discharge, a person's pretrial release, or furlough, or any seizure of property under any State law authorizing civil forfeiture so long as the evidence for the violation was acquired as a result of the person seeking or obtaining emergency medical assistance in the event of an overdose. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
OPIOID OVERDOSE REDUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 83 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0476 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 083-034-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-016-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-03-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-01 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |