IL HB3444 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Funds Investment Act. Provides that on any investment of public funds by the State of Illinois, or by a State official on behalf of the State, that entitles the State to a shareholder voting interest in a corporation, the State, or a designated State official, shall issue votes in its capacity as a shareholder. Provides that any vote made by the State in its capacity as a shareholder shall be recorded and reported to the General Assembly, and made publicly available on the Internet website of the State Treasurer.
Title
PUBLIC FUNDS INVESTMENT-VOTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3444&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3444.htm |