IL HB3440 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2013, as follows: General Funds $629,693,800; Other State Funds $4,673,700; Total $634,367,500.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$U OF I FY14 OCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2014-06-30HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-04-02HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2013-08-09HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-11HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2013-03-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-08HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2013-03-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback