IL HB3438 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Beginning with the 2022-2023 academic year, requires the governing board of each public university and community college district to designate an employee as an Undocumented Student Resource Liaison to be available on campus to provide assistance to undocumented students and mixed status students within the United States in streamlining access to financial aid and academic support to successfully matriculate to degree completion. Sets forth other provisions concerning the liaison. Encourages each governing board to establish an Undocumented Student Resource Center on each of its campuses to offer support services, as well as mental health counseling options. Sets forth other provisions concerning the center. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
HIGHER ED-DREAM RESOURCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0475 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-011-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-003-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-03-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-220 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |