IL HB3437 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires school boards to give at least 60 days' notice of the closure of a school for at least one school year to all affected students, parents, and legal guardians. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCH CLOSING NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-002-000
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-008-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-002-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback