IL HB3433 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Paid Family Leave Program Act. Directs the Department of Employment Security to create a paid family leave program. Provides for premium contributions by both employees and employers. Provides that employees may take paid leave from employment for medical reasons on behalf of themselves and to provide care for family members with a serious medical condition. Allows for paid leave to bond with newborn and newly adopted children. Establishes computation of benefit amounts and contributions by employees and employers toward the cost of the program. Contains provisions regarding the administration of the program. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAID FAMILY LEAVE-IDES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-24HouseTo Wage Policy & Study Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback