IL HB3424 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Creates the Veterans' Disability Compensation Task Force. Provides specified objectives for the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall consist of 15 members appointed by the chairs of the Veterans Affairs Committees in the House of Representatives and the Senate. Provides that the members of the Task Force shall be members of different Illinois counties' Veterans Assistance Commissions, Veteran Service Officers, VITAS officials, and AMVETS officials. Provides that the Task Force shall meet once each month and that joint hearings of the Veterans Affairs Committees of the House of Representatives and Senate shall be held once each month. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall prepare a report of its findings and recommendations and submit it to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before May 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEPT VET AFF-TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 012-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028056New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback