IL HB3419 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that an expatriate corporation shall be considered a non-resident bidder for purposes of the Code. Provides that no business or member of a unitary business group shall submit a bid for or enter into a contract with a State agency under the Code if the business is an expatriate corporation. Defines "expatriate corporation". Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that notwithstanding provisions of the Act, any person formed or incorporated in a foreign tax haven may be a member of a unitary business group without regard to where its business activities are conducted. Defines "foreign tax haven". Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the Illinois Investment Policy Board to make its best efforts to identify all expatriate companies and include those companies in the list of restricted companies distributed to each retirement system and the Illinois State Board of Investment.
Title
EXPATRIATE CORP/FOREIGN HAVEN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0551 |
2017-11-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-11-08 | House | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 039-012-000 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2017-10-25 | House | Verified |
2017-10-25 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 075-036-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-10-12 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-10-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-010-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-005-000 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-028-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-15.120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 45-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 50-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-110.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |