IL HB3416 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Industrial Hemp Act. Adds the term "hemp" to the definition of "industrial hemp"; makes other changes to the definition of "industrial hemp". Adds and defines the definition of "hemp production plan". Removes a reference to federal law in provisions concerning the cultivation of industrial hemp in this State without a license issued by the Illinois Department of Agriculture. Requires the Illinois Department of Agriculture to submit to the Secretary of the United States Department of Agriculture a hemp production plan to allow the Illinois Department of Agriculture to monitor and regulate hemp production in this State. Provides for rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
MASS ANIMAL MORTALITY EVENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0690 |
2021-12-17 | House | Effective Date December 17, 2021 |
2021-12-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-11-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-10-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-10-28 | House | House Concurs |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-10-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Joyce |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 610 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 610 | 17.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 610 | 19a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 48-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |