IL HB3415 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act and the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that when using predictive data analytics in determining creditworthiness or in making hiring decisions, the use of predictive data analytics may not include information that correlates with the race of zip code of the applicant for credit or employment. Provides that a person or entity that relies either partially or fully on predictive data analytics to determine a consumer's creditworthiness may not allow information about the consumer's preference that correlates with the consumer's race or zip code to influence any conclusion regarding the consumer's creditworthiness. Provides that a person or entity that violates the provision commits an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.
Title
LIMIT PREDICTIVE ANALYTICS USE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2WWW | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 112 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 112 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3415&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3415.htm |