IL HB3412 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of In God We Trust special license plate decals by the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs. Provides for the original and renewal fees and fee distribution for the In God We Trust decals issued by the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-IN GOD WE TRUST PLATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseTo Special License Plates and Decals for Universal Special License Plates Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-699.14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback