IL HB3411 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that the amount of the credit shall be 100% (currently, 75%) of the total amount of qualified contributions made by the taxpayer during the taxable year. Provides that the annual aggregate credit cap shall be $100,000,000 per calendar year (currently, $75,000,000). Provides that the individual credit cap shall be $1,333,333 per taxpayer (currently, $1,000,000). Removes a limitation preventing contributions from being directed to a particular subset of schools or a particular school. Provides that, in granting scholarships, first priority shall be given to eligible students who received a scholarship from a scholarship granting organization during the previous school year. Contains provisions concerning technical academies.
Title
INVEST IN KIDS-CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 40 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 65 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 40 | 995 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3411&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3411.htm |