IL HB3410 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a unit of local government or school district with an operating budget of $1,000,000 or more shall maintain an Internet website and post to its website for the current calendar or fiscal year specified information. Provides that the information required to be posted must be easily accessible from the unit of local government's or school district's website home page and searchable. Provides penalties for noncompliance. Provides that no home rule unit may adopt posting requirements that are less restrictive than those provided in the Act. Provides that all local records required to be posted shall remain posted on the entity's website, or subsequent websites, for 10 years. Exempts the School District of the Department of Juvenile Justice. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides an exemption from inspection and copying of any record or information that a unit of local government or school district maintains an electronic copy of on its Internet website in order to comply with the Open Meetings Act. Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that within 6 months after the effective date of this amendatory Act, the Illinois Transparency and Accountability Portal shall have the capability to compile and update its database with information received from all school districts and units of local government. Authorizes the Illinois Transparency and Accountability Portal to provide direct access to information compiled under specified provisions of the Open Meetings Act. Provides an exempt mandate provision. Provides a severability clause. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Remains in Cities & Villages Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Cities & Villages Committee; 004-006-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 010-001-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 120 | 2.03.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |