IL HB3409 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Fire Marshal Act. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal shall adopt new rules for the storage, handling, and use of ethylene oxide for sterilization and fumigation in accordance with Section 55 of the National Fire Protection Association Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRE MARSHAL-ETHYLENE OXIDE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2029055New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback