IL HB3405 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that subject to federal approval, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the LINK card issued by the Department of Human Services for the purpose of enabling cardholders to obtain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits or cash shall only be used for in-state transactions. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules and regulations necessary to implement this provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-LINK CARD-RESTRICTED USE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseTo Public Benefits Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.4aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback