IL HB3403 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that the contribution rate for any calendar year shall be based upon the 2, rather than 3, calendar years immediately preceding the calendar year for which the rate is being determined.
Title
UNEMP INS EXPER RATING 2 YEARS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 1506.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3403&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3403.htm |