IL HB3402 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, when hiring or assigning physical education, music, and visual arts educators, a school district must prioritize the hiring or assigning of educators who hold an educator license and endorsement in those content areas. Provides that a professional educator licensure applicant must pass the licensure content area test for the content area he or she is assigned to teach or complete at least 9 semester hours of coursework in the content area prior to his or her employment start date. Provides that, in order to retain his or her employment for subsequent school years, the employee must complete the remaining hours of coursework in the content area in which he or she is teaching and apply for a license endorsement within 3 calendar years after his or her employment start date. Provides that, in the case of a reduction in force, a school district may follow its employee contract language for filling positions.
Title
SCH CD-HIRING PRIORITIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0046 |
2023-06-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-032-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |