IL HB3396 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Joint Municipal Electric Power Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that "eligible utilities" under the Act includes an electric cooperative which is an independent system operator within the electrical power system, a regional transmission organization within the electrical power system, or an entity that participates as a buyer or seller in an organized independent system operator market or regional transmission organization market.
Title
MUNI CD-ELIGIBLE UTILITY
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0177 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-119.1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |