IL HB3395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Includes federal or State public records in the definition of "expunge". Amends various Acts related to occupational and professional licensing. Provides that no consideration shall be given to convictions entered prior to the date of the application, where the applicant has completed any sentence imposed for that conviction, including any period of mandatory supervised release.
Title
LICENSING-CRIMINAL CONVICTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-003-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3395&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3395.htm |