IL HB3393 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice to send to a consumer an unsolicited check that, when cashed, obligates the recipient to repay the amount of the check plus interest and fees. Provides that the provision does not apply to a transaction in which a consumer has submitted an application for, or requested an extension of, credit from the person before receiving the check or instrument, or when the consumer has an existing relationship with the person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON FRAUD UNSOLICITED CHECKS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Financial Institutions
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 013-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052WWWNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback