IL HB3390 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall revoke for one year the Firearm Owner's Identification Card of a card holder who reports to the local law enforcement agency his or her firearms lost or stolen in 3 separate incidents within a 2-year period. Provides that any law enforcement agency that has knowledge that a card holder has reported his or her firearms lost or stolen in 3 separate incidents within a 2-year period shall forthwith forward that information to the Department of State Police. Provides that for the purposes of this provision, an "incident" means an occasion in which the card holder's firearm or firearms have been lost or stolen regardless of the number of firearms stolen in the incident and the report of the loss or theft of the firearm or firearms on one occasion shall be considered one incident. Provides that if a law enforcement agency recovers a firearm that had been lost or stolen and has not been previously reported as lost or stolen, the recovery of the firearm shall be considered an incident for the purpose of this provision. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the sentence for attempt to acquire a firearm by use of a revoked Firearm Owner's Identification Card is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OWNERS ID-REVOKE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430658Amended CodeCitation Text
72058-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback