IL HB3385 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that each public body shall designate one or more public officials or employees of the public body (instead of "one or more officials or employees") to act as its Freedom of Information officer or officers.
Title
FOIA-OFFICERS: QUALIFICATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-003-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |