IL HB3372 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 20 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Flag Display Act. Provides for the procedure and the occasions in which the United States national flag shall be flown at half-staff. Defines "half-staff".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FLAG DISPLAY-HALF STAFF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-17HouseSent to the Governor
2021-10-20HousePassed Both Houses
2021-10-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-10-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 20, 2021
2021-10-19SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-19SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2021-10-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-10-13SenateRe-assigned to State Government
2021-08-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-06-15SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass State Government; 009-000-000
2021-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-05-10SenateAssigned to State Government
2021-04-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-28SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
546511New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback