IL HB3371 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that required training in suicide awareness and prevention techniques shall last at least 2 hours. Allows the State Board of Education to by rule provide for the training to be included as a continuing professional development requirement under the Code.
Title
SCH CD-SUICIDE PREV TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-001-000 |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |