IL HB3369 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish guidelines for the creation of a high-skilled manufacturing curriculum to be used in vocational education programs.
Title
SCH CD-HIGH-SKILLED MANUFACTUR
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0175 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |