IL HB3368 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to create model curriculum for use by school districts with secondary schools for the teaching of entrepreneur skills. Requires the State Board to encourage the input of business groups and universities in the creation of the model curriculum.
Title
SCH CD-ENTREPRENEUR CURRICULUM
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0174 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |