IL HB3359 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Provides that if a student has a personal support worker through the Home-Based Support Services Program for Adults with Mental Disabilities under the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act, the governing board of the public university or community college district must permit the personal support worker to attend class with the student but is not responsible for providing or paying for the personal support worker. Provides that if the personal support worker's attendance in class is solely to provide personal support services to the student, the governing board may not charge the personal support worker tuition and fees for such attendance. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-SUPPORT WORKER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0568 |
2021-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2021 |
2021-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Bos |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-220 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |