IL HB3358 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Data Transparency and Privacy Act different than that contained in House Amendment No. 2. Finds that individuals have a right to privacy and a personal property interest in information pertaining to the individual. Provides that an entity that collects through the Internet personal information about individual consumers must make disclosures to the individual regarding the collection of the information. Exempts from the protections information collected while a natural person is acting in an employment context. Establishes that a consumer has a right to opt out of the sale of the consumer's information. Creates exemptions for certain retail transactions, credit arrangements, and government program utilization. Provides for enforcement by the Attorney General. Provides that there is no private right of action to enforce the Act. Effective April 1, 2020.
Title
BUSINESS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 To Subcommittee on Business Entities |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-003-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-003-000 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-003-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 072-037-001 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-006-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-002-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-28 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-28 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 530 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |