IL HB3355 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in imposing a sentence for a Class 3 or 4 felony, other than a violent crime as defined in the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act, the court shall determine and indicate in the sentencing order whether the defendant has 4 or more or fewer than 4 months remaining on his or her sentence accounting for time served. Provides that an offender sentenced to a term of imprisonment for a Class 3 or 4 felony, other than a violent crime as defined in the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act, in which the sentencing order indicates that the offender has less than 4 months remaining on his or her sentence accounting for time served may not be confined in the penitentiary system of the Department of Corrections but may be assigned to electronic home detention, an adult transition center, or another facility or program within the Department of Corrections. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
CD CORR-CONFINEMENT-CLASS 3&4
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-003-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-003-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |