IL HB3354 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a person who first becomes a firefighter under the Article on or after January 1, 2011 and who is not receiving a disability pension under specified provisions dies for specified reasons, then a pension shall be paid to his or her survivors in the amount equal to the greater of (i) 54% of the firefighter's monthly salary at the date of death or (ii) 66 2/3% of the firefighter's earned pension at the date of death (rather than the amount of 66 2/3% of the firefighter's earned pension at the date of death). Provides that the changes apply without regard to whether the deceased firefighter was in service on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-DNST FIRE-TIER 2
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-14 | House | To Administrative and Substantive Pension Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 4-114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3354&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3354.htm |