IL HB3349 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall create a Clean Water Workforce Pipeline Program to provide grants and other financial assistance to prepare and support individuals for careers in water infrastructure. Provides specified groups that may be provided with grants and other financial assistance on a competitive annual basis. Directs the Department to coordinate with the Environmental Protection Agency, Illinois Finance Authority, and other State agencies that provide financial support for water infrastructure projects. Provides that the Department may select a Program Administrator. Provides that recipients of grants or other financial assistance under the Program shall report annually to the Department. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Clean Water Workforce Development Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CLEAN WATER WORKFORCE PIPELINE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-009-000
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605913New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback