IL HB3347 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Requires the Authority to produce a monthly Pretrial Order Report, Pretrial Bail Proceeds Report, and Pretrial Custody and Release Report. Specifies requirements for these reports. Provides that the Authority shall post each county's monthly Pretrial Order Report, Pretrial Custody and Release Report, and Pretrial Bail Proceeds Report on the Authority's website on a monthly basis and those reports shall remain on the website for at least 5 years after being posted. Amends the Counties Code and the Clerk of Courts Act to require certain reporting requirements. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Changes violation of bail bond to violation of conditions of pre-trial release. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Abolishes monetary bail under the Code, except under the Uniform Criminal Extradition Act. Provides for considerations for granting and denying pre-trial release. Provides that a person arrested with or without a warrant on an offense for which pre-trial release may not be denied shall, except as otherwise provided, be released by the officer without appearing before a judge. Provides that the court may use a regularly validated risk assessment tool to determine conditions of release. Provides that if a risk assessment tool is used, the defendant's counsel shall be provided with the information and scoring system of the risk assessment tool used to arrive at the determination. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABOLISH MONETARY BAIL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2039307.7New CodeSee Bill Text
2039307.8New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-6041New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-6042New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-6403New CodeSee Bill Text
70510530New CodeSee Bill Text
70510531New CodeSee Bill Text
720532-10Amended CodeCitation Text
7255109-1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-1.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7255110-2Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-4Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-5Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-5.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback