IL HB3343 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a Restaurant Meals Program to permit individuals who are elderly, persons with a disability, and homeless individuals to redeem their Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits at private establishments that contract with the Department to offer meals for eligible SNAP recipients at concessional prices. Requires the Restaurant Meals Program to be operational no later than January 1, 2020. Requires the Department to adopt rules. Effective immediately.
Title
SNAP RESTAURANT MEALS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0110 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date July 19, 2019 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-001-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-018-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |