IL HB3340 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Trauma Scene Waste Management Registration Act. Provides for the registration of trauma scene waste management practitioners. Provides that no person shall perform, offer to perform, or engage in the cleanup of a trauma scene or the removal or remediation of regulated biomedical waste from any trauma scene unless such person is registered in accordance with the Act or is an employee or independent contractor of a person registered in accordance with the Act. Sets forth provisions concerning registration; registration and renewal fees; list of registrations; requirements for registration; insurance requirements; unregistered activities; civil penalties; estimate of services; emergency exceptions; exceptions; and rules. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act on January 1, 2032.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAUMA SCENE WASTE MANAGEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-24HouseTo Workforce Development Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback