IL HB3340 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Contains a declaration of policy and intent. Requires the Department of Human Services, in partnership with specified State agencies, to develop and implement a plan to phase out, by July 1, 2024, authorizations under the Minimum Wage Law to pay an employee with a disability less than the minimum wage. Requires the Department to consult with specified organizations when implementing the phase-out plan. Requires the Secretary of Human Services to submit reports to the Governor and the General Assembly on the benchmarks and status of achieving the outcomes included in the phase-out plan and recommendations for funding levels or other resources necessary to implement the phase-out plan. Amends the Department of Labor Law. Prohibits the Director of Labor from authorizing a work activities center or other sheltered workshop to pay an employee who has a disability less than the minimum wage unless certain requirements are met. Amends the Illinois Council on Developmental Disabilities Law. Requires the Illinois Council on Developmental Disabilities to commission an independent study of the phase-out plan; determine whether the plans are having their intended effects; and make recommendations for possible changes in State law or policy regarding the employment of individuals with disabilities. Requires the Council to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by July 1, 2023. Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Provides that the State of Illinois shall not fund any entity that pays individuals less than the minimum wage under a certificate issued by the United States Department of Labor that authorizes Community Rehabilitation Programs to pay individuals less than the wage otherwise required for the individuals under federal law. Effective immediately, except that the provisions amending the Minimum Wage Law take effect July 1, 2024.
Title
SUBMINIMUM WAGE PHASE-OUT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | To Wage Policy and Study Subcommittee |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1305 | 1-80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1305 | 1-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1505 | 1505-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 4010 | 2008 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 105 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 105 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3340&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3340.htm |