IL HB3339 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly the total number of limited-term Illinois Identification Cards and original or replacement Illinois Identification Cards issued to persons released on parole, mandatory supervised release, aftercare release, final discharge, or pardoned from the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice, and the total cost to the Secretary in waiving fees for such persons. Provides that the Secretary shall further report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly any impediments to issuing Illinois Identification Cards to those persons, and provide recommendations to improve access to Illinois Identification Cards for those persons. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections and the Department of Juvenile Justice shall report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly the total number of persons for which those Departments obtained a certified birth certificate and social security card, and provide the total number of verification forms issued by those Departments to persons prior to their release.
Title
SOS-LIMITED TERM ID CARDS
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3339&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3339.htm |