IL HB3338 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board must review the law enforcement, correctional, or court security officer's (currently, police officer) conduct and records to ensure that no officer is certified or provided a valid waiver if that officer has been convicted of a felony offense under the laws of this State or any other state which if committed in this State would be punishable as a felony. Provides that appointed investigators shall be vested with full police powers and authorized to conduct criminal background inquiries using a recognized national law enforcement database or an independent background investigation. Provides that the Board must also ensure that no officer is certified or provided a valid waiver if that officer has been convicted of aggravated battery, domestic battery, violation of an order of protection, or interfering with the reporting of domestic violence, or an offense that would be similar in any other state. Provides that the Peace Officer and Probation Officer Firearm Training Act shall not be subject to home rule preemption under Article VII of the Illinois Constitution. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that active and retired law enforcement officers authorized to carry a firearm under the laws of this State or federal law are not subject to a provision providing that the owner of private real property of any type may prohibit the carrying of concealed firearms on the property under his or her control, but that the owner must post a sign in accordance with the Act indicating that firearms are prohibited on the property, unless the property is a private residence. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DECERTIFICATION-ENFORCEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15153.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5070510.4Amended CodeCitation Text
507055Amended CodeCitation Text
507056Amended CodeCitation Text
507056.1Amended CodeCitation Text
507056.2Amended CodeCitation Text
507058Amended CodeCitation Text
507105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback