IL HB3337 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Illinois Incubator and Collaborative Workspace Initiative Program to be implemented and administered by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Provides that the Program shall support entrepreneurs by providing rent support grants and aiding collaborative workspaces in the acquisition of new tenants. Specifies grant requirements under the Program. Provides eligibility requirements for collaborative workspaces and tenants under the Program. Provides for the adoption of rules.
Title
DCEO-WORKSPACE INITIATIVE PROG
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3337&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3337.htm |