IL HB3337 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the threshold amount of theft not from the person and retail theft that enhances the offense from a misdemeanor to a felony to $2,000. Provides that an enhancement from a misdemeanor to a felony based on a prior conviction must only be for felony theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-THEFT&RETAIL THEFT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720516-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback